HI SB1319 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates the Governor's authority to transfer certain funds to cope with the effects of natural disasters, for operating purposes, or to supplement the Department of Land and Natural Resources' Fire Fighter's Contingency Fund. Effective July 1, 2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1319 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1021 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
HB1021 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).