HI SB1312 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1312

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a sustainable Hawaii workforce program, a sustainable Hawaii workforce advisory committee, and a sustainable Hawaii workforce special fund to meet the goals of the Aloha+ Challenge. Imposes a new 1.5 per cent sustainable tourism tax beginning on 7/1/2022, to fund the sustainable Hawaii workforce program. Special fund is effective on 7/1/2022. Program and advisory committee take effect on 1/1/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Economic Sustainability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to AEN/WTL, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1312 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback