HI SB131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant to Empower Oahu to maintain and expand the weed and seed strategy, which is a collaborative effort to reclaim, restore, and rebuild communities.
Title
Relating To The Weed And Seed Strategy.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB131 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=131&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB131_.HTM |