HI SB131 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes, beginning January 1, 2016, labeling requirements for any food or raw agricultural commodity sold in the State that contains a genetically engineered material, or was produced with a genetically engineered material; establishes exceptions; establishes violations; requires the director of health to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetically Engineered Material; Labeling Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/WAM.
2015-02-20SenateReported from HTH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN/WAM.
2015-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
2015-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
2015-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HTH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2015-01-28SenateRe-Referred to HTH/AGL, CPN/WAM.
2015-01-22SenateReferred to HTH/AGL, CPN.
2015-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback