HI SB1303 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act 272, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act 272, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Part I: Allows the Department of Education to lease public school lands for a term of not more than ninety-nine years per lease. Part II: Amends Act 206, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, to allow the City and County of Honolulu to transfer lands under existing Department of Education facilities directly to the Department of Education, rather than through the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Part III: Excludes lands set aside by the Governor to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority and lands to which Hawaii Public Housing Authority holds title from the definition of public lands in section 1712, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Requires prior legislative approval for the sale of lands to which the Hawaii Public Housing Authority holds title. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Act 272, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1392). |
2019-07-12 | House | Act 272, on 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1392). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Thielen voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 122) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 122). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Yamane, Todd, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:15PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Tarnas, Okimoto. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 786). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2197) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LHE/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen, Wildberger. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, DeCoite, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/WLH on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:25PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 442) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-19 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WTL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |