HI SB13 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB13
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Interstate Compact to Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
Title
Relating To An Interstate Compact To Phase Out Corporate Welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM/JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM/JDC.
HB735 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB735 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=13&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB13_.HTM |