HI SB1293 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State to enter into a mutual assistance agreement with an out-of-state utility or other energy provider in order to restore power and utility service to the State, without regard to any regulatory law, in times of an emergency or natural disaster. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To A Mutual Assistance Agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 439) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1293 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27