HI SB1290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates funds from transient accommodations tax revenues to the Hawaii Tourism Authority in conjunction with the Hawaii Lodging and Tourism Association for the implementation of initiatives to address homelessness in tourist and resort areas. (SB1290 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 2:00PM in Conference Room 309. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Nishihara, Tokuda, K. Kahele Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 581). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1765) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Kobayashi, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1290) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 379) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ETT/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1467 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1290 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 2:00PM in Conference Room 309.
SB1290 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 2:00PM in Conference Room 309.