HI SB1282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1282
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that for a second offense that occurs within five years, rather than one year, of the first conviction of the offense of abuse of a family or household member is a misdemeanor and the person shall be termed a "repeat offender". Establishes that a third or subsequent offense that occurs within five, rather than two, years of a second or subsequent conviction of the offense is a class C felony and allows the prosecution to use prior convictions of the offense of abuse of a family or household member as evidence in the instant offense committed by a repeat offender. Requires the court to immediately order the defendant incarcerated to serve the mandatory sentence imposed for failure to complete the domestic violence intervention program or violation of any other condition of a sentence imposed pursuant to a deferred acceptance of guilty plea or nolo contendere plea. Requires the judiciary, in cooperation with the prosecutor of each county and police department of each county, to annually compile and report on statistics regarding arrests, charges, convictions, and other dispositions based on the offense of abuse of a family or household member. Repeals and reenacts the offense of abuse of a family or household member on 6/30/2020. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Offense Of Abuse Of Family Or Household Members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 376) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:10AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1282 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1491 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1491 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6