HI SB1276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various administrative and technical amendments to the small business regulatory flexibility act. Codifies the small business bill of rights. Effective 07/1/2112. (SB1276 HD1)
Title
Small Business Regulatory Flexibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Berg. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-17-09 7:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Hee, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-05-09 10:20 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-05-09 10:20 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-03-09 at 9:30 am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from EDT/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Sakamoto. | |
2009-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-17-09 11:00am in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/CPN, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |