HI SB1261 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - (S) Recommitted to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - (S) Recommitted to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To provide employer contribution amounts for plan year 20102011 for Hawaii employerunion health benefits trust fund health benefit plan premiums for the employees of collective bargaining units (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), (7), (8), (9), (10), and (13) and their excluded counterparts. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD2)
Title
Emergency Appropriations for Collective Bargaining Cost Items
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | (S) Recommitted to WAM. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 407) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-14-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1034 (Same As) 2011-03-18 - (S) Act 006, 3/17/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).