HI SB1258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1258
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of a physician-patient relationship via a telehealth interaction, if the physician is licensed to practice medicine in the State. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Telehealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1088) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, LoPresti. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-18-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 132) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1120 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1258 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1258 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.