HI SB1258 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various revisions to renewable energy and net energy metering provisions. Encourages the development of renewable energy in Hawaii. (SB1258 HD2)
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 1:15 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 2:30pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04/27/09 1:30 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, WLO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, Ito, Herkes, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Coffman, Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Hee, Baker, Kim, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 529). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Morita, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-06-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Souki. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-23-09 2:15 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Herkes. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 355) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: English, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE/WTL/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 355) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kokubun. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Espero, Sakamoto. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Bunda, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/CPN deferred the measure until 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-13-09 3:30pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE-WTL-CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-09 3:20 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to ENE/WTL/CPN, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.