HI SB1237 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of health to provide certain public health records to law enforcement officers to facilitate criminal investigations. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Vital Statistics Records; Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from HTH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HTH/PGM, JDL. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1010 (Same As) 2011-02-22 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.