HI SB1236 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to GVO/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to GVO/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the small business office to administer the state small business program. Establishes the state small business program and transfers certain duties of the chief procurement officer to the small business office, which under the state small business program may, among other things, train and assist small businesses in doing business in the State, encourage procurement from small businesses, and establish a goal of awarding twenty per cent of the State's annual purchasing expenditures to small businesses. Requires the small business regulatory review board to adopt rules to define "small business", establish set-asides for small businesses, and encourage the use of small businesses as subcontractors for large government contracts. (SD1)
Title
Procurement; Small Business Office; Hawaii Small Business Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/CPH, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HWN/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN/GVO, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |