HI SB1233 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain private employers to allow employees to take paid leaves of absence for organ, bone marrow, or peripheral blood stem cell donation. Requires employers to restore an employee returning from leave to the same or equivalent position. Establishes a private right of action for employees seeking enforcement of provisions.
Title
Employment; Leave of Absence; Organ, Bone Marrow, or Peripheral Blood Stem Cell Donation
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 356). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 565) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 354) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |