HI SB1231 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Digital Equity Grant Program to award grants to applicants to deploy digital equity projects to covered populations in the State. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Digital Equity.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-23 1:03PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 1:03PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1231 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1408 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
HB1408 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Broadband Access
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Digital Equity Grant Program
Digital Literacy
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Broadband Access
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Digital Equity Grant Program
Digital Literacy
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office