HI SB1230 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the exceptions on the use of a government motor vehicle for personal use to include an officer or employee of any county board of water supply, rather than only the Board of Water Supply of the City and County of Honolulu. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB1230 HD1)
Title
Government Motor Vehicles; Use Exceptions; Board of Water Supply
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from TRN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1147) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, Johanson. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/LAB on Monday, 03-18-13 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to TRN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-15 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 23). |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-14-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |