HI SB123 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies trespassing in the second degree at Hawaii public housing authority housing projects as a nonresident who enters or remains on the property unlawfully or without authorization. Requires the Hawaii public housing authority to post signs notifying trespassers of illegal entry.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Trespass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/JDL, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HSH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HSH, JDL. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB767 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=123&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB123_.HTM |