HI SB1220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 170, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 170, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the University of Hawaii to the list of agencies that are authorized to conduct criminal history record checks on current or prospective employees, whose positions or duties are related to the security of campus facilities and persons. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal History Record Checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Act 170, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272). |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Act 170, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 397). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1501), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 130) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HRE/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HRE/LCA, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1066 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).