HI SB1220 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a youth advisory commission within the office of youth services to advise the governor and legislature on issues relating to youth. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To A Youth Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1466 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1220 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1220 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.