HI SB1220 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Lanai community-based fishery resource management area. Establishes the Lanai community-based fishery resource management area advisory committee to develop a community-based fishery resource management area program to implement traditional fishery management practices on the island of Lanai. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Lanai; Fisheries; Resource Management; Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from WLO/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Chong, Har, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/EEP on Monday, 03-21-11 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 278) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |