HI SB1218 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary small revolving loan program within DBEDT for small businesses on Lanai.
Title
Temporary Small Business Revolving Loan Program; Lanai
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-04-11 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1218 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1218_.HTM |