HI SB1215 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to modify requirements and make new requirements in chapter 454M, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to implement changes and improvements made to NLMS. Authorizes the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to issue cease and desist orders against licensees and unlicensed persons and to enter into consent orders.
Title
Relating To Mortgage Servicers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB989 (Same As)
SB1215 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB1215 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Administrative Proceeding
Cease and Desist
Chapter 91
Commissioner of Financial Institutions
Consent Order
Mortgage Servicers
NMLS
Rules
Unlicensed Persons
Violation
Cease and Desist
Chapter 91
Commissioner of Financial Institutions
Consent Order
Mortgage Servicers
NMLS
Rules
Unlicensed Persons
Violation