HI SB1208 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1208

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 038, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Twin Bridge Farms, Inc., to purchase certain lands. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateAct 038, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
2018-06-13HouseAct 038, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 89-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 89-18).
2018-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Cullen, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 10:02AM in conference room 224.
2018-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 828).
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Rhoads, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Thielen.
2018-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
2018-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 496).
2018-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1934-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola.
2018-04-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
2018-03-20HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-03-14HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ing, Say.
2018-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 69) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2574) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro.
2018-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-08-18 11:15AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-02-16SenateReported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim.
2017-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2017-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2017-01-27SenateReferred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1208 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback