HI SB1200 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of finance to issue general obligation bonds to finance a feasibility study for a small boat harbor in South Puna. (SD1)
Title
Puna Small Boat Harbor; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:35PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |