HI SB12 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB12

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii public housing authority and the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to accomplish certain housing objectives. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing Objectives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 139) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-27SenateRe-Referred to HOU, WAM.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to HOU, JDC.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB12 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 22

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback