HI SB1195 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1195
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to report to the Legislature on the progress and ultimate outcome of the ongoing lease rent renegotiations and to recommend whether the management duties for the valley should be transferred from the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to a different state entity. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Waiahole Valley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1195 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
HB465 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB465 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.