HI SB1195 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the affirmative vote of at least fifty percent of ballots that are voted either YES or NO (which do not include blank votes) and at least forty percent of all ballots that are voted at a general election (which do include blank votes) or an affirmative vote of a majority of ballots that are voted either YES or NO, which must constitute at least thirty percent of the total number of registered voters at a special election for the adoption of a proposed constitutional amendment. (SD1)
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Vote Count; Proposed Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 271) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |