HI SB119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Performing Arts Pilot Program Committee to establish the Performing Arts Pilot Program to select, review, and fund grant proposals for performing arts events. Clarifies the scope of the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts' responsibilities to include administration of the Performing Arts Pilot Program. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to TCA/GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB119 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB119 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Performing Arts Pilot Program
Performing Arts Pilot Program Committee
Report
State Foundation on Culture and the Arts
Performing Arts Pilot Program
Performing Arts Pilot Program Committee
Report
State Foundation on Culture and the Arts