HI SB1187 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires eligible affordable housing projects in community development districts to engage in formal consultation with the Hawaii Community Development Authority. (SB1187 HD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing Projects In Community Development Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Woodson. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EET. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB960 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1187 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
SB1187 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).