HI SB1182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the office of homeless and community services under the department of human services and transfers the office of community services from the department of labor and industrial relations and the homeless programs from the Hawaii public housing authority to the department of human services.
Title
Community Services; Homeless
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 1:30 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HMS/LBR, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1406 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1182&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1182_.HTM |