HI SB1174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides authority for the Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center to set and collect reasonable and necessary fees for services provided. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1174 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB947 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
HB947 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).