HI SB1174 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Act 002, 3/15/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Act 002, 3/15/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes emergency appropriations for costs associated with the operations of the office of the lieutenant governor. Appropriations for LTG100, PSD503, and AGS221. (SD1)
Title
Office of the Lieutenant Governor; Emergency Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Act 002, 3/15/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2013-03-18 | House | Act 002, on 3/15/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 375). |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Rhoads, Souki excused (2). |
2013-03-11 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-08-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 330) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB947 (Same As) 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
HB943 (Same As) 2013-01-25 - Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 216).
HB943 (Same As) 2013-01-25 - Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 216).