HI SB1172 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1172
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules to establish a lay net permit for the use or possession of lay nets, including reasonable permit fees and provisions for revocation, suspension, and withholding of permits for non-compliance with lay net rules.
Title
Relating To Lay Nets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1172 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
HB1018 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Act 045, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
HB1018 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Act 045, 06/08/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1172&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1172_.HTM |