HI SB1168 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1168

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to amend and extend existing pasture leases and to issue new pasture leases by negotiation to further the public purposes that the Department of Land and Natural Resources (Department) is responsible for promoting. Requires lease rents for pastoral and agricultural leases to be determined based on agricultural use value. Allows the Department to alter or convert the use of the productive agricultural land transferred under certain circumstances. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Authorizing The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Lease Pasture Lands On Terms That Promote Collaborative Beneficial Use For Forestry, Wildlife, Recreational, And Food Production Purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:15PM in conference room 229 & Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1014 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1168 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback