HI SB1167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that no public entity or public employee shall be liable to any person for injury or damage sustained on government land when engaged in mountain climbing, rock climbing, rappelling, and bouldering.
Title
Limited Liability; Government Land; Mountain Climbing, Rock Climbing, Rappelling, and Bouldering
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB936 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1167&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1167_.htm |