HI SB1164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1164
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the fire chief and ocean safety director of each county, in addition to the Director of Public Safety and police chief of each county, to transmit to the Department of Land and Natural Resources a copy of every report relating to boating accidents or the theft, loss, or recovery of vessels. Requires all reports submitted to be unredacted.
Title
Relating To Boating Reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1164 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to WTL, JDC.
HB1010 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
HB1010 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1164&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1164_.HTM |