HI SB1163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises statutory provisions relating to the regulation of mineral resources under chapters 171 and 182, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to include geothermal within the definition of a "renewable energy producer" and to provide clarity, eliminate ambiguities, and incorporate technical, nonsubstantive changes in accordance with Act 97, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012.
Title
Mineral Resources
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The recommendation was not adopted. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 1 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 4 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/ENE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:40PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB932 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1163&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1163_.htm |