HI SB1157 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts active members of the Hawaii Emergency Management Agency and county emergency management agencies from jury duty.
Title
Relating To Exemptions From Jury Duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1157 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB904 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB904 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1157&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1157_.HTM |