HI SB1144 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the marriage license application fee to support the Hawaii birth defects program and operating costs of marriage license agents. Amends remittances of the increased fee to various special funds and accounts in unspecified amounts. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Marriage License Fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Wakai. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1144 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB990 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB990 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Birth Defects Program
Birth Defects Special Fund
Marriage License Fee
Spouse and Child Abuse Special Account
Spouse and Child Abuse Special Fund
Birth Defects Special Fund
Marriage License Fee
Spouse and Child Abuse Special Account
Spouse and Child Abuse Special Fund