HI SB1143 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1143

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates an accessible parking special account within the disability and communication access board special fund. Increases the state vehicle registration fee by $1, to be deposited into the accessible parking special account. Requires all costs associated with the statewide parking program for persons with disabilities to be appropriated from the accessible parking special account beginning July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Funding For Parking For Disabled Persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB989 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1143 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HMS, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback