HI SB1135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1135
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the Land Use Commission with the power to amend, revise, or modify a decision and order granting a district boundary amendment, or fine a petitioner, when there has been a finding by the Land Use Commission that a petitioner or its successors or assigns have not adhered to a representation made by the petitioner or a condition imposed by the commission, regardless of whether there has been substantial commencement of use of the land. Defines "substantial commencement". Effective 1/1/2020. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Land Use Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 373) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1135 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27