HI SB1125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Education to design and construct photovoltaic panel coverings over playgrounds at all Department of Education schools.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1125 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
HB896 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
HB896 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1125&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1125_.HTM |