HI SB1125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DBEDT for the establishment of a State of Hawaii sister-state office in the State of Goa, Republic of India. Requires that DBEDT report at least twenty days prior to the convening of the 2018 regular session of the legislature regarding trade, economic development, business partnerships, cultural exchange, and educational exchange in the Republic of India and the State of Goa, and between the State of Goa and Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Of Goa, Republic Of India.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from IAA/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, English, S. Chang, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to IAA/ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ETT/IAA, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1224 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1125 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1125 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.