HI SB1124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 129, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a licensed psychiatrist or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority and psychiatric specialization to determine, prior to a person's discharge from a psychiatric facility, whether an assisted community treatment plan is indicated and to make certain arrangements if so indicated. Amends the criteria for assisted community treatment. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mental Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct 129, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
2019-06-28HouseAct 129, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 169).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, C. Lee, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, C. Lee, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2075), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-18HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1351) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1145) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 9:10AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback