HI SB1115 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1115

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee

Summary

Appropriates funds for two full-time equivalent (2.00 FTE) enforcement specialist IV positions to be primarily responsible for the enforcement of Hawaiis workers' compensation, temporary disability insurance, and prepaid health care laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2017-02-17SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2017-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-01-27SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1208 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB1115 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback