HI SB11 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB11
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the requirement of notifying the Terrorist Screening Center administered by the Federal Bureau of Investigation as part of the gun permit application background check process.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB11 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB804 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB804 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Firearms and Ammunition
Gun Permit Application Background Check
Terrorist Screening Database
Terrorist Watch List
Gun Permit Application Background Check
Terrorist Screening Database
Terrorist Watch List
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=11&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB11_.HTM |