HI SB1087 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1087
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the requirement for public employers to make annual required contributions to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund through fiscal year 2024-2025. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 346) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1087 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB933 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB933 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Annual Required Contribution
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-employment Benefits Trust
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-employment Benefits Trust