HI SB1080 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Public Safety & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Public Safety & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act to ensure ability of members of the military and others eligible voters who are overseas to participate in all elections for federal, state, and county offices. Authorizes ballots and balloting materials to be transmitted by facsimile or electronic mail. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Military and Overseas Voters Act
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 244) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB461 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.